Manufacturer: Stratford Works
Builder | Stratford Works |
Order Date | 01/1899 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | J67 |
Information | Shunting |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
255 | J67 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0T | 03/1899 | 05/1937 | ||
256 | J67 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0T | 03/1899 | 26/04/1958 | ||
257 | J67 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0T | 03/1899 | 13/08/1955 | ||
258 | J67 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0T | 03/1899 | 06/1958 | ||
259 | J67 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0T | 03/1899 | 05/1937 | ||
260 | J67 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0T | 03/1899 | 21/05/1956 | ||
261 | J67 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0T | 04/1899 | 01/10/1959 | ||
262 | J67 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0T | 04/1899 | 01/05/1958 | ||
263 | J67 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0T | 04/1899 | 30/01/1956 | ||
264 | J67 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0T | 04/1899 | 29/09/1955 |