Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 181 Today
» 1015 Yesterday
» 4349 Week
» 19463 Month
» 322653 Year
» 1544218 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/H88
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 04/1923
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class D16

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1780   D16 LNER Hill 4-4-0 06/1923 01/01/1957  
1781   D16 LNER Hill 4-4-0 06/1923 24/11/1959  
1782   D16 LNER Hill 4-4-0 06/1923 25/10/1960  
1783   D16 LNER Hill 4-4-0 07/1923 18/08/1958  
1784   D16 LNER Hill 4-4-0 07/1923 13/10/1958  
1785   D16 LNER Hill 4-4-0 07/1923 23/02/1953  
1786   D16 LNER Hill 4-4-0 08/1923 20/05/1957  
1787   D16 LNER Hill 4-4-0 08/1923 23/11/1959  
1788   D16 LNER Hill 4-4-0 09/1923 07/10/1957  
1789   D16 LNER Hill 4-4-0 09/1923 10/10/1955