Manufacturer: Stratford Works
Builder | Stratford Works |
Order Date | 1909 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | F4 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
71 | F4 | GER | Holden | 2-4-2T | 03/1909 | 24/04/1948 | ||
72 | F4 | GER | Holden | 2-4-2T | 03/1909 | 24/04/1948 | ||
73 | F4 | GER | Holden | 2-4-2T | 03/1909 | 03/1935 | ||
74 | F4 | GER | Holden | 2-4-2T | 03/1909 | 12/01/1953 | ||
75 | F4 | GER | Holden | 2-4-2T | 04/1909 | 04/1950 | ||
76 | F4 | GER | Holden | 2-4-2T | 04/1909 | 08/12/1952 | ||
77 | F4 | GER | Holden | 2-4-2T | 04/1909 | 24/04/1948 | ||
78 | F4 | GER | Holden | 2-4-2T | 04/1909 | 22/07/1953 | ||
79 | F4 | GER | Holden | 2-4-2T | 05/1909 | 18/08/1955 | ||
80 | F4 | GER | Holden | 2-4-2T | 05/1909 | 02/1936 |