Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 98 Today
» 1103 Yesterday
» 5735 Week
» 18839 Month
» 18839 Year
» 1240404 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/L52
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 07/1901
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class J16

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1170   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 09/1901 22/02/1961  
1171   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 09/1901 11/02/1962  
1172   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 09/1901 29/09/1958  
1173   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 10/1901 13/05/1957  
1174   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 10/1901 21/03/1955  
1175   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 10/1901 13/04/1959  
1176   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 10/1901 10/08/1959  
1177   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 10/1901 17/04/1959  
1178   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 10/1901 14/11/1961  
1179   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 10/1901 12/05/1958