Manufacturer: Stratford Works
Builder | Stratford Works |
Order Date | 03/1903 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | D14 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1860 | D14 | GER | Holden | 4-4-0 | 05/1903 | 21/03/1955 | ||
1861 | D14 | GER | Holden | 4-4-0 | 05/1903 | 12/11/1956 | ||
1862 | D14 | GER | Holden | 4-4-0 | 05/1903 | 23/09/1957 | ||
1863 | D14 | GER | Holden | 4-4-0 | 06/1903 | 11/11/1958 | ||
1864 | D14 | GER | Holden | 4-4-0 | 06/1903 | 25/11/1957 | ||
1865 | D14 | GER | Holden | 4-4-0 | 09/1903 | 25/07/1955 | ||
1866 | D14 | GER | Holden | 4-4-0 | 09/1903 | 09/1945 | ||
1867 | D14 | GER | Holden | 4-4-0 | 10/1903 | 28/04/1952 | ||
1868 | D14 | GER | Holden | 4-4-0 | 10/1903 | 28/10/1957 | ||
1869 | D14 | GER | Holden | 4-4-0 | 11/1903 | 24/08/1959 |