Manufacturer: Stratford Works
Builder | Stratford Works |
Order Date | 06/1922 |
Class | J20 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1275 | J20 | GER | Hill | 0-6-0 | 09/1922 | 13/01/1961 | ||
1276 | J20 | GER | Hill | 0-6-0 | 09/1922 | 02/11/1960 | ||
1277 | J20 | GER | Hill | 0-6-0 | 09/1922 | 23/09/1960 | ||
1278 | J20 | GER | Hill | 0-6-0 | 09/1922 | 11/1959 | ||
1279 | J20 | GER | Hill | 0-6-0 | 09/1922 | 27/06/1960 | ||
1280 | J20 | GER | Hill | 0-6-0 | 10/1922 | 06/10/1960 | ||
1281 | J20 | GER | Hill | 0-6-0 | 10/1922 | 22/08/1960 | ||
1282 | J20 | GER | Hill | 0-6-0 | 10/1922 | 16/09/1962 | ||
1283 | J20 | GER | Hill | 0-6-0 | 11/1922 | 12/01/1959 | ||
1284 | J20 | GER | Hill | 0-6-0 | 11/1922 | 13/01/1961 |