Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 577 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 3720 Week
» 13890 Month
» 291686 Year
» 1176067 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/M87
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 06/1922
Class J20

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1275   J20 GER Hill 0-6-0 09/1922 13/01/1961  
1276   J20 GER Hill 0-6-0 09/1922 02/11/1960  
1277   J20 GER Hill 0-6-0 09/1922 23/09/1960  
1278   J20 GER Hill 0-6-0 09/1922 11/1959  
1279   J20 GER Hill 0-6-0 09/1922 27/06/1960  
1280   J20 GER Hill 0-6-0 10/1922 06/10/1960  
1281   J20 GER Hill 0-6-0 10/1922 22/08/1960  
1282   J20 GER Hill 0-6-0 10/1922 16/09/1962  
1283   J20 GER Hill 0-6-0 11/1922 12/01/1959  
1284   J20 GER Hill 0-6-0 11/1922 13/01/1961