Manufacturer: Stratford Works
Builder | Stratford Works |
Order Date | 10/1895 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | J67 |
Information | Passenger |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
387 | J67 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0T | 12/1895 | 03/10/1960 | ||
388 | J67 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0T | 12/1895 | 10/1940 | ||
389 | J67 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0T | 12/1895 | 06/08/1962 | ||
390 | J67 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0T | 12/1895 | 05/09/1962 | ||
391 | J67 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0T | 01/1896 | 18/08/1957 | ||
392 | J67 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0T | 01/1896 | 08/05/1958 | ||
393 | J67 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0T | 01/1896 | 02/06/1960 | ||
394 | J67 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0T | 01/1896 | 10/09/1961 | ||
395 | J67 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0T | 02/1896 | 04/12/1960 | ||
396 | J67 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0T | 02/1896 | 29/11/1954 |