Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1896 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | Dean Goods |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2491 | 1511 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 08/1896 | 14/05/1934 | |
2492 | 1512 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 08/1896 | 05/1932 | |
2493 | 1513 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 08/1896 | 05/1932 | |
2494 | 1514 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 08/1896 | 16/11/1934 | |
2495 | 1515 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 08/1896 | 05/1932 | |
2496 | 1516 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 09/1896 | 10/03/1934 | |
2497 | 1517 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 09/1896 | 09/1930 | |
2498 | 1518 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 09/1896 | 08/1932 | |
2499 | 1519 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 09/1896 | 08/1930 | |
2500 | 1520 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 09/1896 | 04/1931 | |
2501 | 1521 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 10/1896 | 05/1932 | |
2502 | 1522 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 10/1896 | 02/1931 | |
2503 | 1523 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 10/1896 | 06/1931 | |
2504 | 1524 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 10/1896 | 19/10/1933 | |
2505 | 1525 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 10/1896 | 10/1932 | |
2506 | 1526 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 11/1896 | 06/1931 | |
2507 | 1527 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 11/1896 | 10/1930 | |
2508 | 1528 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 11/1896 | 14/09/1934 | |
2509 | 1529 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 11/1896 | 07/1932 | |
2510 | 1530 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 12/1896 | 04/1931 |