Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1897 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | Dean Goods |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2511 | 1552 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 02/1897 | 10/1940 | |
2512 | 1553 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 02/1897 | 10/1940 | |
2513 | 1554 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 02/1897 | 01/07/1955 | |
2514 | 1555 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 03/1897 | 10/1940 | |
2515 | 1556 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 03/1897 | 05/02/1953 | |
2516 | 1557 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 03/1897 | 28/05/1956 | |
2517 | 1558 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 04/1897 | 10/1940 | |
2518 | 1559 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 04/1897 | 10/1940 | |
2519 | 1560 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 04/1897 | 10/1940 | |
2520 | 1561 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 04/1897 | 10/1940 | |
2521 | 1562 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 05/1897 | 12/1940 | |
2522 | 1563 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 05/1897 | 10/1940 | |
2523 | 1564 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 05/1897 | 13/09/1949 | |
2524 | 1565 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 05/1897 | 10/1940 | |
2525 | 1566 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 05/1897 | 22/12/1945 | |
2526 | 1567 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 05/1897 | 10/1940 | |
2527 | 1568 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 06/1897 | 10/1940 | |
2528 | 1569 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 06/1897 | 12/1940 | |
2529 | 1570 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 06/1897 | 10/1940 | |
2530 | 1571 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 06/1897 | 20/10/1945 |