Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1906 |
For | 19 Steam locomotives |
Class | 3100/5100 |
Information | A 20th engine for this order is Number 3150, the prototype of the 3150 class. |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
3131 | 2138 | 3100/5100 | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 01/1906 | 25/10/1948 | |
3132 | 2139 | 3100/5100 | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 01/1906 | 07/08/1951 | |
3133 | 2140 | 3100/5100 | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 01/1906 | 29/11/1960 | |
3134 | 2141 | 3100/5100 | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 02/1906 | 09/04/1951 | |
3135 | 2142 | 3100/5100 | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 02/1906 | 23/08/1949 | |
3136 | 2143 | 3100/5100 | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 02/1906 | 01/10/1951 | |
3137 | 2144 | 3100/5100 | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 02/1906 | 01/10/1951 | |
3138 | 2145 | 3100/5100 | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 02/1906 | 08/11/1952 | |
3139 | 2146 | 3100/5100 | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 03/1906 | 05/11/1952 | |
3140 | 2147 | 3100/5100 | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 03/1906 | 21/07/1953 | |
3141 | 2148 | 3100/5100 | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 03/1906 | 30/10/1952 | |
3142 | 2149 | 3100/5100 | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 03/1906 | 26/05/1952 | |
3143 | 2150 | 3100/5100 | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 03/1906 | 03/12/1951 | |
3144 | 2151 | 3100/5100 | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 03/1906 | 28/01/1952 | |
3145 | 2152 | 3100/5100 | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 03/1906 | 28/11/1963 | |
3146 | 2153 | 3100/5100 | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 03/1906 | 10/05/1948 | |
3147 | 2154 | 3100/5100 | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 03/1906 | 05/01/1953 | |
3148 | 2155 | 3100/5100 | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 03/1906 | 21/12/1959 | |
3149 | 2156 | 3100/5100 | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 03/1906 | 24/04/1947 |