Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1907 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | 28xx |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2821 | 2158 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 01/1907 | 21/09/1960 | |
2822 | 2159 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 01/1907 | 27/11/1964 | |
2823 | 2160 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 01/1907 | 24/04/1959 | |
2824 | 2161 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 01/1907 | 20/08/1959 | |
2825 | 2162 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 01/1907 | 31/03/1959 | |
2826 | 2163 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 01/1907 | 22/09/1959 | |
2827 | 2164 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 02/1907 | 11/08/1958 | |
2828 | 2165 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 02/1907 | 26/01/1959 | |
2829 | 2166 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 02/1907 | 13/02/1959 | |
2830 | 2167 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 02/1907 | 30/01/1959 |