Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 440 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 1779 Week
» 31277 Month
» 368123 Year
» 1589688 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Swindon Works



Order Details for Lot No: SW/173
Builder Swindon Works
Order Date 1908
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class Star

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
4011 2300 Star GWR Churchward 4-6-0 03/1908 11/1932  
4012 2301 Star GWR Churchward 4-6-0 03/1908 21/10/1949  
4013 2302 Star GWR Churchward 4-6-0 03/1908 03/05/1950  
4014 2303 Star GWR Churchward 4-6-0 03/1908 04/06/1946  
4015 2304 Star GWR Churchward 4-6-0 03/1908 09/02/1951  
4016 2305 Star GWR Churchward 4-6-0 04/1908 24/09/1951  
4017 2306 Star GWR Churchward 4-6-0 04/1908 11/11/1949  
4018 2307 Star GWR Churchward 4-6-0 04/1908 23/04/1951  
4019 2308 Star GWR Churchward 4-6-0 05/1908 28/10/1949  
4020 2309 Star GWR Churchward 4-6-0 05/1908 21/03/1951