Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1909 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | Star |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
4021 | 2365 | Star | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 06/1909 | 10/10/1952 | |
4022 | 2366 | Star | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 06/1909 | 14/02/1952 | |
4023 | 2367 | Star | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 06/1909 | 12/07/1952 | |
4024 | 2368 | Star | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 06/1909 | 02/1935 | |
4025 | 2369 | Star | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 07/1909 | 14/08/1950 | |
4026 | 2370 | Star | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 09/1909 | 20/02/1950 | |
4027 | 2371 | Star | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 09/1909 | 10/10/1934 | |
4028 | 2372 | Star | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 09/1909 | 09/11/1951 | |
4029 | 2373 | Star | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 10/1909 | 30/11/1934 | |
4030 | 2374 | Star | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 10/1909 | 29/05/1950 |