Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1914 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | 42xx |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
4232 | 2587 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 08/1914 | 21/10/1963 | |
4233 | 2588 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 08/1914 | 09/10/1964 | |
4234 | 2589 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 09/1914 | 30/09/1963 | |
4235 | 2590 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 09/1914 | 27/08/1962 | |
4236 | 2591 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 10/1914 | 17/09/1962 | |
4237 | 2592 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 10/1914 | 08/04/1964 | |
4238 | 2593 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 10/1914 | 16/12/1963 | |
4239 | 2594 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 10/1914 | 07/09/1964 | |
4240 | 2595 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 10/1914 | 06/01/1964 | |
4241 | 2596 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 10/1914 | 24/04/1964 |