Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1914 |
For | 15 Steam locomotives |
Class | 45xx |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
4540 | 2597 | 45xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 11/1914 | 03/03/1959 | |
4541 | 2598 | 45xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 11/1914 | 26/10/1955 | |
4542 | 2599 | 45xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 11/1914 | 26/09/1955 | |
4543 | 2600 | 45xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 11/1914 | 28/08/1950 | |
4544 | 2601 | 45xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 11/1914 | 25/09/1952 | |
4545 | 2602 | 45xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 12/1914 | 08/09/1958 | |
4546 | 2603 | 45xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 12/1914 | 06/01/1958 | |
4547 | 2604 | 45xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 12/1914 | 08/02/1960 | |
4548 | 2605 | 45xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 05/1915 | 11/11/1957 | |
4549 | 2606 | 45xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 05/1915 | 12/12/1961 | |
4550 | 2607 | 45xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 02/1915 | 24/10/1960 | |
4551 | 2608 | 45xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 02/1915 | 17/02/1958 | |
4552 | 2609 | 45xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 03/1915 | 25/09/1961 | |
4553 | 2610 | 45xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 03/1915 | 08/12/1958 | |
4554 | 2611 | 45xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 03/1915 | 06/09/1958 |