Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1916 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | 43xx |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
5300 | 2672 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 11/1916 | 15/01/1953 | |
5301 | 2673 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 12/1916 | 10/1937 | |
5302 | 2674 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 12/1916 | 26/05/1948 | |
5303 | 2675 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 12/1916 | 28/05/1951 | |
5304 | 2676 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 12/1916 | 05/1937 | |
5305 | 2677 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 01/1917 | 01/07/1952 | |
5306 | 2678 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 01/1917 | 06/07/1964 | |
5307 | 2679 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 01/1917 | 26/11/1956 | |
5308 | 2680 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 02/1917 | 01/1939 | |
5309 | 2681 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 02/1917 | 27/01/1953 |