Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1917 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | 43xx |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
5310 | 2682 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 06/1917 | 31/07/1958 | |
5311 | 2683 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 06/1917 | 24/10/1960 | |
5312 | 2684 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 06/1917 | 24/10/1958 | |
5313 | 2685 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 06/1917 | 13/05/1958 | |
5314 | 2686 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 06/1917 | 22/07/1957 | |
5315 | 2687 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 07/1917 | 17/02/1959 | |
5316 | 2688 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 07/1917 | 21/06/1956 | |
5317 | 2689 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 07/1917 | 05/11/1956 | |
5318 | 2690 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 07/1917 | 04/09/1961 | |
5319 | 2691 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 08/1917 | 16/11/1959 | |
5320 | 2692 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 08/1917 | 27/09/1948 | |
5321 | 2693 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 08/1917 | 14/09/1959 | |
5322 | 2694 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 08/1917 | 24/04/1964 | |
5323 | 2695 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 09/1917 | 09/06/1958 | |
5324 | 2696 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 09/1917 | 16/09/1960 | |
5325 | 2697 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 09/1917 | 26/08/1957 | |
5326 | 2698 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 09/1917 | 15/03/1962 | |
5327 | 2699 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 09/1917 | 02/07/1956 | |
5328 | 2700 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 09/1917 | 29/07/1958 | |
5329 | 2701 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 09/1917 | 03/1939 |