Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1917 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | 43xx |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
5330 | 2702 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 09/1917 | 15/06/1964 | |
5331 | 2703 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 09/1917 | 10/11/1960 | |
5332 | 2704 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 11/1917 | 09/10/1961 | |
5333 | 2705 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 11/1917 | 16/05/1960 | |
5334 | 2706 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 11/1917 | 18/11/1957 | |
5335 | 2707 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 12/1917 | 16/10/1958 | |
5336 | 2708 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 12/1917 | 07/09/1964 | |
5337 | 2709 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 12/1917 | 24/10/1960 | |
5338 | 2710 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 01/1918 | 11/08/1958 | |
5339 | 2711 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 01/1918 | 29/11/1960 | |
5340 | 2712 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 01/1918 | 27/09/1948 | |
5341 | 2713 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 02/1918 | 28/07/1959 | |
5342 | 2714 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 02/1918 | 04/1937 | |
5343 | 2715 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 02/1918 | 03/07/1948 | |
5344 | 2716 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 03/1918 | 22/09/1958 | |
5345 | 2717 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 03/1918 | 08/06/1959 | |
5346 | 2718 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 03/1918 | 07/05/1951 | |
5347 | 2719 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 03/1918 | 21/04/1958 | |
5348 | 2720 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 03/1918 | 04/01/1952 | |
5349 | 2721 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 04/1918 | 10/05/1948 |