Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1918 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | 43xx |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
5350 | 2722 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 07/1918 | 07/12/1959 | |
5351 | 2723 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 08/1918 | 13/06/1961 | |
5352 | 2724 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 08/1918 | 06/1937 | |
5353 | 2725 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 08/1918 | 02/05/1960 | |
5354 | 2726 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 08/1918 | 05/1937 | |
5355 | 2727 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 08/1918 | 23/04/1959 | |
5356 | 2728 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 08/1918 | 12/10/1959 | |
5357 | 2729 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 09/1918 | 21/09/1962 | |
5358 | 2730 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 09/1918 | 17/07/1962 | |
5359 | 2731 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 09/1918 | 22/10/1951 | |
5360 | 2732 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 01/1919 | 26/09/1958 | |
5361 | 2733 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 02/1919 | 18/01/1960 | |
5362 | 2734 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 02/1919 | 22/07/1958 | |
5363 | 2735 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 02/1919 | 09/1937 | |
5364 | 2736 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 03/1919 | 16/07/1951 | |
5365 | 2737 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 04/1919 | 05/03/1951 | |
5366 | 2738 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 05/1919 | 03/1939 | |
5367 | 2739 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 05/1919 | 29/09/1958 | |
5368 | 2740 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 06/1919 | 25/09/1958 | |
5369 | 2741 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 06/1919 | 20/11/1963 |