Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1923 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | 43xx |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
6342 | 2887 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 03/1923 | 17/09/1962 | |
6343 | 2888 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 03/1923 | 21/09/1960 | |
6344 | 2889 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 03/1923 | 20/11/1963 | |
6345 | 2890 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 04/1923 | 07/09/1964 | |
6346 | 2891 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 04/1923 | 07/09/1964 | |
6347 | 2892 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 04/1923 | 28/12/1963 | |
6348 | 2893 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 04/1923 | 19/02/1962 | |
6349 | 2894 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 05/1923 | 10/08/1964 | |
6350 | 2895 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 05/1923 | 06/01/1964 | |
6351 | 2896 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 05/1923 | 21/11/1960 | |
6352 | 2897 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 09/1923 | 21/11/1960 | |
6353 | 2898 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 09/1923 | 24/05/1963 | |
6354 | 2899 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 10/1923 | 23/02/1959 | |
6355 | 2900 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 10/1923 | 02/03/1959 | |
6356 | 2901 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 11/1923 | 14/01/1963 | |
6357 | 2902 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 11/1923 | 13/07/1964 | |
6358 | 2903 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 11/1923 | 12/10/1959 | |
6359 | 2904 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 11/1923 | 07/09/1959 | |
6360 | 2905 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 11/1923 | 21/11/1960 | |
6361 | 2906 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 12/1923 | 06/05/1964 |