Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 690 Today
» 1270 Yesterday
» 7053 Week
» 9635 Month
» 274268 Year
» 1495833 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Swindon Works



Order Details for Lot No: SW/216
Builder Swindon Works
Order Date 1923
For 20 Steam locomotives
Class 43xx

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
6342 2887 43xx GWR Churchward 2-6-0 03/1923 17/09/1962  
6343 2888 43xx GWR Churchward 2-6-0 03/1923 21/09/1960  
6344 2889 43xx GWR Churchward 2-6-0 03/1923 20/11/1963  
6345 2890 43xx GWR Churchward 2-6-0 04/1923 07/09/1964  
6346 2891 43xx GWR Churchward 2-6-0 04/1923 07/09/1964  
6347 2892 43xx GWR Churchward 2-6-0 04/1923 28/12/1963  
6348 2893 43xx GWR Churchward 2-6-0 04/1923 19/02/1962  
6349 2894 43xx GWR Churchward 2-6-0 05/1923 10/08/1964  
6350 2895 43xx GWR Churchward 2-6-0 05/1923 06/01/1964  
6351 2896 43xx GWR Churchward 2-6-0 05/1923 21/11/1960  
6352 2897 43xx GWR Churchward 2-6-0 09/1923 21/11/1960  
6353 2898 43xx GWR Churchward 2-6-0 09/1923 24/05/1963  
6354 2899 43xx GWR Churchward 2-6-0 10/1923 23/02/1959  
6355 2900 43xx GWR Churchward 2-6-0 10/1923 02/03/1959  
6356 2901 43xx GWR Churchward 2-6-0 11/1923 14/01/1963  
6357 2902 43xx GWR Churchward 2-6-0 11/1923 13/07/1964  
6358 2903 43xx GWR Churchward 2-6-0 11/1923 12/10/1959  
6359 2904 43xx GWR Churchward 2-6-0 11/1923 07/09/1959  
6360 2905 43xx GWR Churchward 2-6-0 11/1923 21/11/1960  
6361 2906 43xx GWR Churchward 2-6-0 12/1923 06/05/1964