Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1921 |
For | 15 Steam locomotives |
Class | 43xx |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
7305 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 11/1921 | 17/09/1962 | ||
7306 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 11/1921 | 01/09/1964 | ||
7307 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 11/1921 | 01/06/1964 | ||
7308 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 11/1921 | 15/06/1964 | ||
7309 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 11/1921 | 27/09/1962 | ||
7310 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 12/1921 | 15/06/1964 | ||
7311 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 12/1921 | 17/09/1962 | ||
7312 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 12/1921 | 28/12/1963 | ||
7313 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 12/1921 | 03/07/1962 | ||
7314 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 12/1921 | 26/02/1963 | ||
7315 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 12/1921 | 16/12/1963 | ||
7316 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 12/1921 | 17/09/1962 | ||
7317 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 12/1921 | 28/12/1963 | ||
7318 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 12/1921 | 06/11/1964 | ||
7319 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 01/1922 | 09/10/1964 |