Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1923 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | Castle |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
4073 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 11/08/1923 | 10/05/1960 | ||
4074 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 12/1923 | 03/05/1963 | ||
4075 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 01/1924 | 03/11/1961 | ||
4076 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 07/02/1924 | 08/02/1963 | ||
4077 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 10/02/1924 | 02/08/1962 | ||
4078 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 24/02/1924 | 02/07/1962 | ||
4079 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 04/03/1924 | 14/05/1964 | ||
4080 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 23/03/1924 | 10/08/1964 | ||
4081 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 03/1924 | 01/01/1963 | ||
4082 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 12/04/1924 | 07/09/1964 |