Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1923 |
For | 30 Steam locomotives |
Class | 42xx |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
5215 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 03/1924 | 13/07/1964 | ||
5216 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 04/1924 | 25/10/1963 | ||
5217 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 04/1924 | 24/05/1963 | ||
5218 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 04/1924 | 07/09/1964 | ||
5219 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 04/1924 | 06/12/1962 | ||
5220 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 05/1924 | 28/12/1963 | ||
5221 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 05/1924 | 25/10/1963 | ||
5222 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 05/1924 | 06/05/1964 | ||
5223 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 05/1924 | 08/03/1965 | ||
5224 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 05/1924 | 11/04/1963 | ||
5225 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 05/1924 | 19/08/1963 | ||
5226 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 05/1924 | 19/03/1965 | ||
5227 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 06/1924 | 01/02/1963 | ||
5228 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 06/1924 | 20/04/1964 | ||
5229 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 06/1924 | 24/05/1963 | ||
5230 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 06/1924 | 06/07/1964 | ||
5231 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 06/1924 | 20/04/1964 | ||
5232 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 07/1924 | 14/01/1963 | ||
5233 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 07/1924 | 01/08/1963 | ||
5234 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 07/1924 | 24/06/1963 | ||
5235 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 07/1924 | 10/09/1965 | ||
5236 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 08/1924 | 07/10/1963 | ||
5237 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 08/1924 | 07/09/1964 | ||
5238 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 08/1924 | 15/01/1964 | ||
5239 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 08/1924 | 25/04/1963 | ||
5240 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 08/1924 | 14/02/1964 | ||
5241 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 08/1924 | 16/06/1965 | ||
5242 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 08/1924 | 26/12/1964 | ||
5243 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 08/1924 | 27/11/1964 | ||
5244 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 09/1924 | 06/05/1964 |