Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1924 |
For | 50 Steam locomotives |
Class | 56xx |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
5600 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 12/1924 | 27/07/1962 | ||
5601 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 12/1924 | 15/01/1965 | ||
5602 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 12/1924 | 07/09/1964 | ||
5603 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 12/1924 | 28/09/1964 | ||
5604 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 01/1925 | 13/11/1962 | ||
5605 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 01/1925 | 21/05/1966 | ||
5606 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 02/1925 | 13/11/1965 | ||
5607 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 02/1925 | 16/12/1963 | ||
5608 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 02/1925 | 29/08/1963 | ||
5609 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 02/1925 | 19/10/1964 | ||
5610 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 02/1925 | 16/12/1963 | ||
5611 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 02/1925 | 09/01/1963 | ||
5612 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 02/1925 | 25/04/1963 | ||
5613 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 02/1925 | 07/05/1965 | ||
5614 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 02/1925 | 29/08/1963 | ||
5615 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 03/1925 | 02/07/1963 | ||
5616 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 03/1925 | 23/09/1963 | ||
5617 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 03/1925 | 01/09/1962 | ||
5618 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 03/1925 | 19/03/1965 | ||
5619 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 03/1925 | 15/06/1964 | ||
5620 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 06/1925 | 16/07/1963 | ||
5621 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 06/1925 | 03/06/1965 | ||
5622 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 06/1925 | 06/06/1963 | ||
5623 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 06/1925 | 14/02/1964 | ||
5624 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 06/1925 | 01/06/1964 | ||
5625 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 08/1925 | 25/10/1963 | ||
5626 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 08/1925 | 02/12/1963 | ||
5627 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 08/1925 | 11/04/1963 | ||
5628 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 08/1925 | 11/02/1963 | ||
5629 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 08/1925 | 14/05/1964 | ||
5630 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 08/1925 | 05/12/1962 | ||
5631 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 08/1925 | 13/09/1962 | ||
5632 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 09/1925 | 07/09/1964 | ||
5633 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 09/1925 | 07/05/1965 | ||
5634 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 09/1925 | 24/07/1964 | ||
5635 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 09/1925 | 14/05/1964 | ||
5636 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 09/1925 | 21/05/1962 | ||
5637 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 09/1925 | 15/06/1964 | ||
5638 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 09/1925 | 14/02/1964 | ||
5639 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 09/1925 | 21/05/1962 | ||
5640 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 10/1925 | 06/06/1963 | ||
5641 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 10/1925 | 07/09/1964 | ||
5642 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 10/1925 | 21/09/1962 | ||
5643 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 10/1925 | 02/07/1963 | ||
5644 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 11/1925 | 17/06/1963 | ||
5645 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 11/1925 | 07/06/1963 | ||
5646 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 11/1925 | 01/09/1962 | ||
5647 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 11/1925 | 10/03/1964 | ||
5648 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 11/1925 | 28/09/1964 | ||
5649 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 11/1925 | 15/03/1963 |