Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1925 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | Castle |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
4083 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 09/05/1925 | 19/12/1961 | ||
4084 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 30/05/1925 | 11/10/1960 | ||
4085 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 10/06/1925 | 02/05/1962 | ||
4086 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 20/06/1925 | 03/04/1962 | ||
4087 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 27/06/1925 | 03/10/1963 | ||
4088 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 25/07/1925 | 14/05/1964 | ||
4089 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 08/07/1925 | 07/09/1964 | ||
4090 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 15/08/1925 | 06/06/1963 | ||
4091 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 01/08/1925 | 19/01/1959 | ||
4092 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 06/08/1925 | 19/12/1961 |