Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1925 |
For | 30 Steam locomotives |
Class | 42xx |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
5245 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 11/1925 | 09/10/1964 | ||
5246 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 12/1925 | 28/12/1963 | ||
5247 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 12/1925 | 01/03/1963 | ||
5248 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 12/1925 | 03/10/1963 | ||
5249 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 12/1925 | 22/10/1963 | ||
5250 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 12/1925 | 16/12/1963 | ||
5251 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 12/1925 | 15/01/1964 | ||
5252 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 12/1925 | 07/05/1965 | ||
5253 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 12/1925 | 25/04/1963 | ||
5254 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 12/1925 | 24/07/1964 | ||
5255 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 12/1925 | 07/09/1964 | ||
5256 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 12/1925 | 28/11/1964 | ||
5257 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 12/1925 | 15/01/1965 | ||
5258 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 01/1926 | 13/11/1964 | ||
5260 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 03/1926 | 06/05/1964 | ||
5261 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 03/1926 | 13/11/1964 | ||
5262 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 03/1926 | 24/06/1963 | ||
5263 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 03/1926 | 29/07/1963 | ||
5264 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 03/1926 | 10/08/1964 | ||
5265 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 03/1926 | 06/07/1964 | ||
5266 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 03/1926 | 09/10/1964 | ||
5267 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 03/1926 | 21/05/1965 | ||
5268 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 03/1926 | 07/09/1964 | ||
5269 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 03/1926 | 22/10/1963 | ||
5270 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 04/1926 | 20/04/1964 | ||
5271 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 04/1926 | 13/11/1963 | ||
5272 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 04/1926 | 17/06/1963 | ||
5273 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 04/1926 | 20/04/1964 | ||
5274 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 04/1926 | 22/10/1963 | ||
5259 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 01/1926 | 06/12/1962 |