Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1926 |
For | 30 Steam locomotives |
Class | 4575 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
4575 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 02/1927 | 15/08/1960 | ||
4576 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 02/1927 | 18/09/1958 | ||
4577 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 02/1927 | 02/11/1959 | ||
4578 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 02/1927 | 22/08/1958 | ||
4579 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 02/1927 | 08/09/1958 | ||
4580 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 02/1927 | 23/06/1958 | ||
4581 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 02/1927 | 21/04/1958 | ||
4582 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 02/1927 | 28/04/1958 | ||
4583 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 02/1927 | 27/01/1958 | ||
4584 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 02/1927 | 06/02/1959 | ||
4585 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 03/1927 | 12/10/1959 | ||
4586 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 03/1927 | 16/04/1956 | ||
4587 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 03/1927 | 01/08/1960 | ||
4588 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 03/1927 | 13/07/1962 | ||
4589 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 03/1927 | 21/09/1960 | ||
4590 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 03/1927 | 24/10/1958 | ||
4591 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 03/1927 | 10/08/1964 | ||
4592 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 03/1927 | 18/01/1960 | ||
4593 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 03/1927 | 07/09/1964 | ||
4594 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 04/1927 | 07/11/1960 | ||
4595 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 04/1927 | 16/12/1958 | ||
4596 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 04/1927 | 16/09/1957 | ||
4597 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 04/1927 | 27/01/1958 | ||
4598 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 04/1927 | 17/12/1956 | ||
4599 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 04/1927 | 13/03/1959 | ||
5500 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 04/1927 | 12/10/1959 | ||
5501 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 05/1927 | 21/07/1958 | ||
5502 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 05/1927 | 14/07/1958 | ||
5503 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 05/1927 | 30/05/1961 | ||
5504 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 05/1927 | 24/10/1960 |