Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 87 Today
» 1224 Yesterday
» 3899 Week
» 33397 Month
» 370243 Year
» 1591808 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Swindon Works



Order Details for Lot No: SW/258
Builder Swindon Works
Order Date 1928
For 30 Steam locomotives
Class 57xx

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
5750   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 04/1929 09/05/1960  
5751   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 04/1929 04/1958  
5752   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 04/1929 30/11/1960  
5753   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 04/1929 14/09/1959  
5754   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 04/1929 20/06/1960  
5755   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 04/1929 18/07/1960  
5756   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 05/1929 05/09/1961  
5757   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 05/1929 30/11/1960  
5758   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 05/1929 15/05/1962  
5759   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 05/1929 23/09/1960  
5760   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 05/1929 14/10/1957  
5761   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 06/1929 07/05/1962  
5762   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 06/1929 19/03/1956  
5763   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 06/1929 02/05/1960  
5764   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 06/1929 22/05/1960  
5765   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 06/1929 23/03/1959  
5766   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 07/1929 07/05/1962  
5767   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 07/1929 09/1958  
5768   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 07/1929 02/03/1961  
5769   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 07/1929 28/05/1960  
5770   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 09/1929 20/12/1961  
5771   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 09/1929 10/03/1961  
5772   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 09/1929 06/1958  
5773   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 09/1929 12/09/1962  
5774   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 09/1929 05/10/1962  
5775   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 09/1929 14/01/1963  
5776   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 09/1929 02/05/1960  
5777   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 09/1929 06/1958  
5778   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 09/1929 24/07/1962  
5779   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 09/1929 07/05/1962