Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1930 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | 42xx |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
5275 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 07/1930 | 02/07/1963 | ||
5276 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 08/1930 | 21/04/1965 | ||
5277 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 08/1930 | 01/06/1964 | ||
5278 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 08/1930 | 16/12/1963 | ||
5279 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 08/1930 | 26/02/1964 | ||
5280 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 08/1930 | 16/06/1965 | ||
5281 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 08/1930 | 06/07/1964 | ||
5282 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 08/1930 | 14/11/1964 | ||
5283 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 09/1930 | 20/04/1964 | ||
5284 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 09/1930 | 24/07/1964 | ||
5285 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 09/1930 | 30/04/1965 | ||
5286 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 09/1930 | 06/05/1964 | ||
5287 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 09/1930 | 14/02/1964 | ||
5288 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 09/1930 | 07/09/1964 | ||
5289 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 10/1930 | 16/12/1963 | ||
5290 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 10/1930 | 24/06/1963 | ||
5291 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 10/1930 | 07/10/1963 | ||
5292 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 10/1930 | 06/07/1964 | ||
5293 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 10/1930 | 05/09/1964 | ||
5294 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 10/1930 | 22/01/1964 |