Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1931 |
For | 30 Steam locomotives |
Class | 61xx |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
6100 | 61xx | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 04/1931 | 29/09/1958 | ||
6101 | 61xx | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 05/1931 | 05/03/1962 | ||
6102 | 61xx | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 05/1931 | 17/08/1959 | ||
6103 | 61xx | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 05/1931 | 26/12/1964 | ||
6104 | 61xx | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 05/1931 | 30/06/1960 | ||
6105 | 61xx | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 05/1931 | 14/03/1960 | ||
6106 | 61xx | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 05/1931 | 31/12/1965 | ||
6107 | 61xx | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 05/1931 | 27/11/1964 | ||
6108 | 61xx | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 05/1931 | 06/08/1965 | ||
6109 | 61xx | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 06/1931 | 29/08/1962 | ||
6110 | 61xx | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 08/1931 | 16/06/1965 | ||
6111 | 61xx | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 08/1931 | 31/12/1965 | ||
6112 | 61xx | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 08/1931 | 10/09/1965 | ||
6113 | 61xx | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 08/1931 | 18/11/1965 | ||
6114 | 61xx | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 09/1931 | 23/10/1964 | ||
6115 | 61xx | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 09/1931 | 06/11/1964 | ||
6116 | 61xx | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 09/1931 | 16/06/1965 | ||
6117 | 61xx | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 09/1931 | 10/09/1965 | ||
6118 | 61xx | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 09/1931 | 25/11/1963 | ||
6119 | 61xx | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 09/1931 | 01/03/1963 | ||
6120 | 61xx | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 09/1931 | 13/04/1962 | ||
6121 | 61xx | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 10/1931 | 21/07/1960 | ||
6122 | 61xx | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 10/1931 | 21/09/1964 | ||
6123 | 61xx | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 10/1931 | 05/04/1962 | ||
6124 | 61xx | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 10/1931 | 15/06/1964 | ||
6125 | 61xx | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 10/1931 | 15/01/1965 | ||
6126 | 61xx | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 10/1931 | 31/12/1965 | ||
6127 | 61xx | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 10/1931 | 05/03/1962 | ||
6128 | 61xx | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 10/1931 | 26/03/1965 | ||
6129 | 61xx | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 11/1931 | 18/09/1965 |