Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1932 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | 43xx |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
9300 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 02/1932 | 03/11/1961 | ||
9301 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 02/1932 | 10/08/1962 | ||
9302 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 02/1932 | 22/10/1962 | ||
9303 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 02/1932 | 24/04/1964 | ||
9304 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 02/1932 | 17/09/1963 | ||
9305 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 02/1932 | 06/11/1964 | ||
9306 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 03/1932 | 03/04/1962 | ||
9307 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 03/1932 | 07/01/1963 | ||
9308 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 03/1932 | 25/09/1962 | ||
9309 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 03/1932 | 01/09/1962 | ||
9310 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 03/1932 | 08/04/1964 | ||
9311 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 03/1932 | 03/10/1963 | ||
9312 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 03/1932 | 03/04/1962 | ||
9313 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 03/1932 | 10/09/1963 | ||
9314 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 03/1932 | 17/09/1962 | ||
9315 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 03/1932 | 01/09/1964 | ||
9316 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 04/1932 | 10/08/1962 | ||
9317 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 04/1932 | 15/06/1964 | ||
9318 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 04/1932 | 15/06/1964 | ||
9319 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 04/1932 | 17/09/1962 |