Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 144 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 7885 Week
» 28327 Month
» 365173 Year
» 1586738 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Swindon Works



Order Details for Lot No: SW/276
Builder Swindon Works
Order Date 1932
For 20 Steam locomotives
Class 43xx

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
9300   43xx GWR Churchward 2-6-0 02/1932 03/11/1961  
9301   43xx GWR Churchward 2-6-0 02/1932 10/08/1962  
9302   43xx GWR Churchward 2-6-0 02/1932 22/10/1962  
9303   43xx GWR Churchward 2-6-0 02/1932 24/04/1964  
9304   43xx GWR Churchward 2-6-0 02/1932 17/09/1963  
9305   43xx GWR Churchward 2-6-0 02/1932 06/11/1964  
9306   43xx GWR Churchward 2-6-0 03/1932 03/04/1962  
9307   43xx GWR Churchward 2-6-0 03/1932 07/01/1963  
9308   43xx GWR Churchward 2-6-0 03/1932 25/09/1962  
9309   43xx GWR Churchward 2-6-0 03/1932 01/09/1962  
9310   43xx GWR Churchward 2-6-0 03/1932 08/04/1964  
9311   43xx GWR Churchward 2-6-0 03/1932 03/10/1963  
9312   43xx GWR Churchward 2-6-0 03/1932 03/04/1962  
9313   43xx GWR Churchward 2-6-0 03/1932 10/09/1963  
9314   43xx GWR Churchward 2-6-0 03/1932 17/09/1962  
9315   43xx GWR Churchward 2-6-0 03/1932 01/09/1964  
9316   43xx GWR Churchward 2-6-0 04/1932 10/08/1962  
9317   43xx GWR Churchward 2-6-0 04/1932 15/06/1964  
9318   43xx GWR Churchward 2-6-0 04/1932 15/06/1964  
9319   43xx GWR Churchward 2-6-0 04/1932 17/09/1962