Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1932 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | 58xx |
Information | Order also included 30 48xx 0-4-2T's. |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
5800 | 58xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 05/01/1933 | 22/07/1958 | ||
5801 | 58xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 04/01/1933 | 09/09/1958 | ||
5802 | 58xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 07/01/1933 | 29/12/1958 | ||
5803 | 58xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 10/01/1933 | 02/07/1957 | ||
5804 | 58xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 12/01/1933 | 01/06/1959 | ||
5805 | 58xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 18/01/1933 | 24/03/1958 | ||
5806 | 58xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 18/01/1933 | 14/06/1957 | ||
5807 | 58xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 23/01/1933 | 14/06/1957 | ||
5808 | 58xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 25/01/1933 | 04/02/1957 | ||
5809 | 58xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 01/02/1933 | 10/08/1959 | ||
5810 | 58xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 07/08/1933 | 05/01/1959 | ||
5811 | 58xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 09/08/1933 | 27/05/1957 | ||
5812 | 58xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 10/08/1933 | 18/06/1957 | ||
5813 | 58xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 14/08/1933 | 30/11/1957 | ||
5814 | 58xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 16/08/1933 | 18/06/1957 | ||
5815 | 58xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 18/08/1933 | 27/04/1961 | ||
5816 | 58xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 22/08/1933 | 02/07/1957 | ||
5817 | 58xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 23/08/1933 | 18/06/1957 | ||
5818 | 58xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 24/08/1933 | 14/09/1959 | ||
5819 | 58xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 29/08/1933 | 26/06/1957 | ||
7700 | 4435 | 58xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 03/1930 | 15/05/1961 | |
7701 | 4436 | 58xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 02/1930 | 01/02/1960 | |
7702 | 4437 | 58xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 02/1930 | 23/09/1960 | |
7703 | 4438 | 58xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 02/1930 | 21/03/1960 | |
7704 | 4439 | 58xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 02/1930 | 23/12/1960 | |
7705 | 4440 | 58xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 03/1930 | 24/08/1959 | |
7706 | 4441 | 58xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 03/1930 | 21/03/1960 | |
7707 | 4442 | 58xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 03/1930 | 09/11/1960 | |
7708 | 4443 | 58xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 03/1930 | 20/06/1960 | |
7709 | 4444 | 58xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 03/1930 | 29/08/1960 | |
7710 | 4445 | 58xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 03/1930 | 08/09/1958 | |
7711 | 4446 | 58xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 03/1930 | 07/10/1956 | |
7712 | 4447 | 58xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 03/1930 | 18/07/1960 | |
7713 | 4448 | 58xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 03/1930 | 16/08/1962 | |
7714 | 4449 | 58xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 05/1930 | 26/01/1959 | |
7715 | 4450 | 58xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 19/05/1930 | 19/05/1963 | |
7716 | 4451 | 58xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 05/1930 | 14/12/1959 | |
7717 | 4452 | 58xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 05/1930 | 07/03/1960 | |
7718 | 4453 | 58xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 05/1930 | 13/04/1962 | |
7719 | 4454 | 58xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 06/1930 | 23/09/1960 | |
7720 | 4455 | 58xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 06/1930 | 01/05/1962 | |
7721 | 4456 | 58xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 06/1930 | 13/07/1962 | |
7722 | 4457 | 58xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 06/1930 | 24/10/1960 | |
7723 | 4458 | 58xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 06/1930 | 29/08/1960 | |
7724 | 4459 | 58xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 07/1930 | 12/09/1962 |