Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 85 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 7539 Week
» 10121 Month
» 274754 Year
» 1496319 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Swindon Works



Order Details for Lot No: SW/285
Builder Swindon Works
Order Date 1934
For 50 Steam locomotives
Class 57xx

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
8799   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 06/1934 01/12/1962  
9711   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 06/1934 21/07/1965  
9712   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 06/1934 25/09/1962  
9713   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 06/1934 23/07/1963  
9714   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 06/1934 07/11/1961  
9715   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 06/1934 23/07/1963  
9716   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 06/1934 16/06/1965  
9717   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 06/1934 18/12/1962  
9718   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 06/1934 21/05/1962  
9719   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 07/1934 24/07/1962  
9720   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 11/1934 22/11/1961  
9721   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 11/1934 22/06/1962  
9722   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 12/1934 13/07/1962  
9723   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 12/1934 24/07/1962  
9724   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 12/1934 15/01/1966  
9725   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 12/1934 12/12/1962  
9726   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 12/1934 16/06/1965  
9727   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 12/1934 09/11/1962  
9728   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 12/1934 21/05/1962  
9729   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 12/1934 23/10/1964  
9730   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 01/1935 06/05/1964  
9731   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 01/1935 02/05/1963  
9732   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 01/1935 08/04/1964  
9733   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 01/1935 25/09/1965  
9734   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 01/1935 06/07/1964  
9735   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 01/1935 02/03/1961  
9736   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 01/1935 23/06/1961  
9737   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 01/1935 14/12/1960  
9738   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 01/1935 18/01/1962  
9739   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 01/1935 04/07/1961  
9740   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 01/1935 02/02/1962  
9741   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 01/1935 03/08/1962  
9742   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 01/1935 01/09/1964  
9743   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 01/1935 20/04/1964  
9744   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 01/1935 14/01/1963  
9745   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 02/1935 30/06/1961  
9746   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 02/1935 10/03/1964  
9747   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 02/1935 14/01/1963  
9748   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 02/1935 06/01/1964  
9749   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 02/1935 09/11/1960  
9750   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 05/1935 14/05/1962  
9751   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 05/1935 13/06/1961  
9752   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 05/1935 28/12/1963  
9753   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 05/1935 08/05/1965  
9754   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 06/1935 16/06/1965  
9755   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 06/1935 02/05/1963  
9756   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 06/1935 01/12/1962  
9757   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 06/1935 16/08/1962  
9758   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 06/1935 07/05/1962  
9759   57xx GWR Collett 0-6-0PT 06/1935 22/10/1962