Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1934 |
For | 15 Steam locomotives |
Class | 64xx |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
6410 | 64xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 05/11/1934 | 13/11/1962 | ||
6411 | 64xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 09/11/1934 | 02/03/1961 | ||
6412 | 64xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 12/11/1934 | 06/11/1964 | ||
6413 | 64xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 13/11/1934 | 14/11/1961 | ||
6414 | 64xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 14/11/1934 | 29/06/1959 | ||
6415 | 64xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 20/11/1934 | 02/11/1961 | ||
6416 | 64xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 23/11/1934 | 23/09/1963 | ||
6417 | 64xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 06/12/1934 | 22/06/1959 | ||
6418 | 64xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 07/12/1934 | 26/11/1962 | ||
6419 | 64xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 11/12/1934 | 26/12/1964 | ||
6420 | 64xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 24/08/1935 | 27/11/1959 | ||
6421 | 64xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 29/08/1935 | 07/01/1963 | ||
6422 | 64xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 31/08/1935 | 27/09/1962 | ||
6423 | 64xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 05/09/1935 | 11/08/1958 | ||
6424 | 64xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 09/09/1935 | 05/09/1964 |