Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1938 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | Hall |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
5976 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 01/09/1938 | 24/07/1964 | ||
5977 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 02/09/1938 | 19/08/1963 | ||
5978 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 05/09/1938 | 21/10/1963 | ||
5979 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 08/09/1938 | 06/11/1964 | ||
5980 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 18/09/1938 | 21/09/1962 | ||
5981 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 03/10/1938 | 21/09/1962 | ||
5982 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 05/10/1938 | 01/09/1962 | ||
5983 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 12/10/1938 | 10/04/1965 | ||
5984 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 14/10/1938 | 15/01/1965 | ||
5985 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 18/10/1938 | 13/09/1963 |