Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1937 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | 5101 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
4120 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 11/12/1937 | 14/11/1964 | ||
4121 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 11/12/1937 | 16/06/1965 | ||
4122 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 01/01/1938 | 15/06/1964 | ||
4123 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 01/01/1938 | 17/11/1961 | ||
4124 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 14/01/1938 | 10/08/1964 | ||
4125 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 02/05/1938 | 19/06/1965 | ||
4126 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 05/05/1938 | 24/01/1962 | ||
4127 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 12/05/1938 | 01/01/1963 | ||
4128 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 18/05/1938 | 15/06/1964 | ||
4129 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 27/05/1938 | 17/09/1962 |