Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1938 |
For | 50 Steam locomotives |
Class | 57xx |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
3600 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 29/12/1938 | 02/12/1963 | ||
3601 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 30/12/1938 | 24/10/1964 | ||
3602 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 04/01/1939 | 06/02/1962 | ||
3603 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 09/01/1939 | 06/07/1964 | ||
3604 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 09/01/1939 | 28/12/1963 | ||
3605 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 23/01/1939 | 01/10/1966 | ||
3606 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 27/01/1939 | 18/12/1962 | ||
3607 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 02/02/1939 | 08/10/1966 | ||
3608 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 02/02/1939 | 16/06/1965 | ||
3609 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 06/02/1939 | 08/08/1960 | ||
3610 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 18/02/1939 | 20/02/1965 | ||
3611 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 25/02/1939 | 24/08/1962 | ||
3612 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 04/03/1939 | 09/10/1964 | ||
3613 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 13/03/1939 | 06/05/1964 | ||
3614 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 18/03/1939 | 14/03/1962 | ||
3615 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 29/03/1939 | 01/10/1965 | ||
3616 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 31/03/1939 | 10/09/1965 | ||
3617 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 11/04/1939 | 07/09/1964 | ||
3618 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 18/04/1939 | 08/06/1964 | ||
3619 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 28/04/1939 | 10/09/1966 | ||
3620 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 05/05/1939 | 16/06/1965 | ||
3621 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 13/05/1939 | 06/11/1964 | ||
3622 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 18/05/1939 | 01/09/1964 | ||
3623 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 23/05/1939 | 01/09/1962 | ||
3624 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 26/05/1939 | 21/05/1962 | ||
3625 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 03/06/1939 | 02/07/1966 | ||
3626 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 03/06/1939 | 01/08/1963 | ||
3627 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 17/06/1939 | 18/02/1963 | ||
3628 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 17/06/1939 | 21/01/1963 | ||
3629 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 24/06/1939 | 14/01/1963 | ||
3630 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 28/06/1939 | 01/09/1962 | ||
3631 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 01/07/1939 | 31/07/1965 | ||
3632 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 04/07/1939 | 13/11/1962 | ||
3633 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 15/07/1939 | 15/10/1963 | ||
3634 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 15/07/1939 | 06/07/1964 | ||
3785 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 21/09/1938 | 06/07/1962 | ||
3786 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 23/09/1938 | 22/03/1963 | ||
3787 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 27/09/1938 | 07/01/1963 | ||
3788 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 29/09/1938 | 06/11/1965 | ||
3789 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 06/10/1938 | 23/10/1965 | ||
3790 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 08/10/1938 | 16/06/1965 | ||
3791 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 12/10/1938 | 02/12/1963 | ||
3792 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 18/10/1938 | 06/11/1965 | ||
3793 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 22/10/1938 | 08/09/1958 | ||
3794 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 27/10/1938 | 26/12/1964 | ||
3795 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 26/11/1938 | 24/05/1963 | ||
3796 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 29/11/1938 | 26/03/1965 | ||
3797 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 01/12/1938 | 06/11/1964 | ||
3798 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 02/12/1938 | 19/10/1964 | ||
3799 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 06/12/1938 | 13/01/1961 |