Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1938 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | 28xx |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2884 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 03/03/1938 | 20/04/1964 | ||
2885 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 04/03/1938 | 22/01/1964 | ||
2886 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 08/03/1938 | 25/06/1964 | ||
2887 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 12/03/1938 | 15/06/1964 | ||
2888 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 17/03/1938 | 18/02/1963 | ||
2889 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 31/03/1938 | 25/04/1963 | ||
2890 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 08/04/1938 | 21/04/1965 | ||
2891 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 11/04/1938 | 23/10/1964 | ||
2892 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 20/04/1938 | 13/05/1963 | ||
2893 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 28/04/1938 | 06/11/1964 | ||
2894 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 15/11/1938 | 01/08/1963 | ||
2895 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 17/11/1938 | 30/04/1965 | ||
2896 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 16/11/1938 | 15/06/1964 | ||
2897 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 18/11/1938 | 01/03/1963 | ||
2898 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 19/11/1938 | 09/10/1964 | ||
2899 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 01/12/1938 | 19/03/1965 | ||
3800 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 03/12/1938 | 10/08/1964 | ||
3801 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 06/12/1938 | 10/08/1964 | ||
3802 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 29/12/1938 | 06/08/1965 | ||
3803 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 07/01/1939 | 04/07/1963 |