Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1939 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | 2251 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2201 | 2251 | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0 | 28/07/1939 | 15/06/1964 | ||
2202 | 2251 | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0 | 01/08/1939 | 11/10/1960 | ||
2203 | 2251 | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0 | 04/08/1939 | 30/06/1960 | ||
2204 | 2251 | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0 | 08/08/1939 | 28/12/1963 | ||
2205 | 2251 | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0 | 15/08/1939 | 15/06/1959 | ||
2206 | 2251 | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0 | 24/08/1939 | 04/12/1961 | ||
2207 | 2251 | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0 | 29/08/1939 | 12/01/1961 | ||
2208 | 2251 | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0 | 02/09/1939 | 15/06/1959 | ||
2209 | 2251 | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0 | 04/09/1939 | 02/08/1962 | ||
2210 | 2251 | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0 | 09/09/1939 | 05/06/1965 |