Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1940 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | 2251 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2211 | 2251 | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0 | 17/05/1940 | 14/11/1964 | ||
2212 | 2251 | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0 | 16/05/1940 | 05/12/1962 | ||
2213 | 2251 | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0 | 18/05/1940 | 10/11/1960 | ||
2214 | 2251 | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0 | 26/05/1940 | 07/05/1965 | ||
2215 | 2251 | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0 | 29/05/1940 | 19/10/1961 | ||
2216 | 2251 | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0 | 02/06/1940 | 15/01/1962 | ||
2217 | 2251 | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0 | 14/06/1940 | 13/11/1964 | ||
2218 | 2251 | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0 | 10/06/1940 | 13/11/1964 | ||
2219 | 2251 | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0 | 17/06/1940 | 17/03/1964 | ||
2220 | 2251 | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0 | 18/06/1940 | 27/12/1961 | ||
2221 | 2251 | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0 | 20/08/1940 | 14/11/1964 | ||
2222 | 2251 | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0 | 23/08/1940 | 21/05/1965 | ||
2223 | 2251 | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0 | 29/08/1940 | 11/05/1962 | ||
2224 | 2251 | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0 | 11/09/1940 | 30/09/1963 | ||
2225 | 2251 | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0 | 16/09/1940 | 15/06/1959 | ||
2226 | 2251 | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0 | 30/09/1940 | 21/08/1959 | ||
2227 | 2251 | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0 | 07/10/1940 | 12/01/1961 | ||
2228 | 2251 | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0 | 15/10/1940 | 15/06/1959 | ||
2229 | 2251 | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0 | 26/10/1940 | 01/09/1962 | ||
2230 | 2251 | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0 | 31/10/1940 | 18/01/1962 |