Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1940 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | Hall |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
6906 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 08/11/1940 | 03/04/1965 | ||
6907 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 09/11/1940 | 06/02/1965 | ||
6908 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 20/11/1940 | 21/07/1965 | ||
6909 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 27/11/1940 | 25/06/1964 | ||
6910 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 10/12/1940 | 01/10/1965 | ||
6911 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 10/01/1941 | 24/04/1965 | ||
6912 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 30/01/1941 | 14/02/1964 | ||
6913 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 07/02/1941 | 25/06/1964 | ||
6914 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 11/02/1941 | 01/04/1964 | ||
6915 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 15/02/1941 | 13/02/1965 |