Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1941 |
For | 43 Steam locomotives |
Class | Hall |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
6916 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 11/06/1941 | 14/08/1965 | ||
6917 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 14/06/1941 | 25/09/1965 | ||
6918 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 18/06/1941 | 10/09/1965 | ||
6919 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 21/06/1941 | 26/08/1963 | ||
6920 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 03/07/1941 | 02/12/1963 | ||
6921 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 11/07/1941 | 26/10/1965 | ||
6922 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 19/07/1941 | 01/05/1965 | ||
6923 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 24/07/1941 | 31/12/1965 | ||
6924 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 05/08/1941 | 26/10/1965 | ||
6925 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 09/08/1941 | 21/11/1964 | ||
6926 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 11/11/1941 | 29/05/1965 | ||
6927 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 15/11/1941 | 01/10/1965 | ||
6928 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 22/11/1941 | 16/06/1965 | ||
6929 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 28/11/1941 | 28/10/1963 | ||
6930 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 29/11/1941 | 16/10/1965 | ||
6931 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 06/12/1941 | 01/10/1965 | ||
6932 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 11/12/1941 | 31/12/1965 | ||
6933 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 15/12/1941 | 14/11/1964 | ||
6934 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 20/12/1941 | 09/10/1965 | ||
6935 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 20/12/1941 | 06/02/1965 | ||
6936 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 11/07/1942 | 13/11/1964 | ||
6937 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 11/07/1942 | 31/12/1965 | ||
6938 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 22/07/1942 | 19/03/1965 | ||
6939 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 27/07/1942 | 28/10/1963 | ||
6940 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 07/08/1942 | 06/05/1964 | ||
6941 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 15/08/1942 | 24/04/1964 | ||
6942 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 22/08/1942 | 14/12/1964 | ||
6943 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 26/08/1942 | 28/12/1963 | ||
6944 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 03/09/1942 | 18/11/1965 | ||
6945 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 08/09/1942 | 01/09/1964 | ||
6946 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 05/12/1942 | 15/06/1964 | ||
6947 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 07/12/1942 | 18/11/1965 | ||
6948 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 11/12/1942 | 02/12/1963 | ||
6949 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 16/12/1942 | 12/05/1961 | ||
6950 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 23/12/1942 | 25/06/1964 | ||
6951 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 08/02/1943 | 25/12/1965 | ||
6952 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 22/02/1943 | 25/12/1965 | ||
6953 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 27/02/1943 | 31/12/1965 | ||
6954 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 02/03/1943 | 14/05/1964 | ||
6955 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 14/03/1943 | 06/02/1965 | ||
6956 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 28/03/1943 | 31/12/1965 | ||
6957 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 01/04/1943 | 26/10/1965 | ||
6958 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 08/04/1943 | 16/06/1965 |