Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1945 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | 57xx |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
9622 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 05/11/1945 | 21/07/1965 | ||
9623 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 08/11/1945 | 21/07/1965 | ||
9624 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 10/11/1945 | 16/01/1965 | ||
9625 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 16/11/1945 | 16/06/1965 | ||
9626 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 27/11/1945 | 31/12/1965 | ||
9627 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 30/11/1945 | 13/07/1962 | ||
9628 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 05/12/1945 | 07/03/1963 | ||
9629 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 13/12/1945 | 09/10/1964 | ||
9630 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 15/12/1945 | 24/09/1966 | ||
9631 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 18/12/1945 | 16/06/1965 | ||
9632 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 29/12/1945 | 06/11/1964 | ||
9633 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 08/01/1946 | 09/10/1963 | ||
9634 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 16/01/1946 | 06/05/1964 | ||
9635 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 24/01/1946 | 25/06/1964 | ||
9636 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 09/02/1946 | 03/10/1963 | ||
9637 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 19/02/1946 | 07/09/1964 | ||
9638 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 25/02/1946 | 28/12/1963 | ||
9639 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 27/02/1946 | 25/09/1965 | ||
9640 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 07/03/1946 | 30/07/1966 | ||
9641 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 12/03/1946 | 29/10/1966 |