Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1946 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | County |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1020 | County | GWR | Hawksworth | 4-6-0 | 14/12/1946 | 26/02/1964 | ||
1021 | County | GWR | Hawksworth | 4-6-0 | 19/12/1945 | 01/11/1963 | ||
1022 | County | GWR | Hawksworth | 4-6-0 | 24/12/1946 | 05/10/1962 | ||
1023 | County | GWR | Hawksworth | 4-6-0 | 01/01/1947 | 01/03/1963 | ||
1024 | County | GWR | Hawksworth | 4-6-0 | 09/01/1947 | 08/04/1964 | ||
1025 | County | GWR | Hawksworth | 4-6-0 | 20/01/1947 | 18/02/1963 | ||
1026 | County | GWR | Hawksworth | 4-6-0 | 31/01/1947 | 13/09/1962 | ||
1027 | County | GWR | Hawksworth | 4-6-0 | 11/03/1947 | 25/10/1963 | ||
1028 | County | GWR | Hawksworth | 4-6-0 | 26/03/1947 | 02/12/1963 | ||
1029 | County | GWR | Hawksworth | 4-6-0 | 10/04/1947 | 05/12/1962 |