Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 192 Today
» 1015 Yesterday
» 4360 Week
» 19474 Month
» 322664 Year
» 1544229 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Swindon Works



Order Details for Lot No: SW/360
Builder Swindon Works
Order Date 1946
For 20 Steam locomotives
Class 2251

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
3200   2251 GWR Collett 0-6-0 21/09/1946 15/01/1965  
3201   2251 GWR Collett 0-6-0 30/09/1946 21/05/1965  
3202   2251 GWR Collett 0-6-0 05/10/1946 20/06/1960  
3203   2251 GWR Collett 0-6-0 09/10/1946 28/12/1963  
3204   2251 GWR Collett 0-6-0 11/10/1946 01/03/1963  
3205   2251 GWR Collett 0-6-0 18/10/1946 21/05/1965  
3206   2251 GWR Collett 0-6-0 21/10/1946 28/12/1963  
3207   2251 GWR Collett 0-6-0 25/10/1946 05/12/1962  
3208   2251 GWR Collett 0-6-0 29/10/1946 08/05/1965  
3209   2251 GWR Collett 0-6-0 08/11/1946 13/06/1964  
3210   2251 GWR Collett 0-6-0 03/12/1947 13/11/1964  
3211   2251 GWR Collett 0-6-0 04/12/1947 01/09/1962  
3212   2251 GWR Collett 0-6-0 09/12/1947 21/10/1963  
3213   2251 GWR Collett 0-6-0 11/12/1947 28/12/1963  
3214   2251 GWR Collett 0-6-0 15/12/1947 25/10/1963  
3215   2251 GWR Collett 0-6-0 17/12/1947 09/01/1963  
3216   2251 GWR Collett 0-6-0 19/12/1947 02/12/1963  
3217   2251 GWR Collett 0-6-0 24/12/1947 14/11/1964  
3218   2251 GWR Collett 0-6-0 02/01/1948 21/05/1965  
3219   2251 GWR Collett 0-6-0 30/01/1948 02/12/1963