Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 207 Today
» 1182 Yesterday
» 4844 Week
» 16137 Month
» 280770 Year
» 1502335 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Swindon Works



Order Details for Lot No: SW/390
Builder Swindon Works
Order Date 1951
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class Standard Class 4

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
75000   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 05/1951 31/12/1965  
75001   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 08/1951 14/12/1964  
75002   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 08/1951 12/08/1967  
75003   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 08/1951 01/10/1965  
75004   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 08/1951 11/03/1967  
75005   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 09/1951 18/11/1965  
75006   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 09/1951 12/08/1967  
75007   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 09/1951 21/04/1965  
75008   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 10/1951 31/12/1965  
75009   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 10/1951 03/08/1968