Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 948 Today
» 1260 Yesterday
» 4547 Week
» 10681 Month
» 238565 Year
» 1460130 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Swindon Works



Order Details for Lot No: SW/400
Builder Swindon Works
Order Date 1953
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class Standard Class 4

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
75020   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 11/1953 03/08/1968  
75021   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 11/1953 10/02/1968  
75022   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 12/1953 31/12/1965  
75023   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 12/1953 15/01/1966  
75024   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 12/1953 11/11/1967  
75025   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 04/1954 31/12/1965  
75026   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 05/1954 30/12/1967  
75027   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 05/1954 03/08/1968  
75028   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 05/1954 11/12/1965  
75029   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 05/1954 12/08/1967